THE HUCKNALL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Making financial grants to qualifying cases within the former UrbanDistrict of Hucknall Nottinghamshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 16 April 1963: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Amy Turner | Trustee | 13 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lee Waters | Trustee | 29 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Christopher Baron | Trustee | 21 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN WILLIAM WHITELOCKS JP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.47k | £5.86k | £6.88k | £8.26k | £8.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.68k | £2.00k | £2.03k | £3.83k | £2.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 07 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 29 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 6 NOVEMBER 1972
Charitable objects
RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY POOR PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE URBAN DISTRICT OF HUCKNALL WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP, OR DISTRESS WITH A PREFERENCE FOR POOR HOUSEHOLDERS WHO ARE RESIDENT AS AFORESAID. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 27 OF SCHEME).
Area of benefit
FORMER URBAN DISTRICT OF HUCKNALL
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 WOODLANDS GROVE
HUCKNALL
NOTTINGHAM
NG15 6SG
- Phone:
- 01159536280
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window