Accounts and annual returns ATCHAM WAR MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 215995
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 18 July 2021 27 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 18 July 2021 27 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 18 July 2020 27 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 18 July 2020 07 April 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 18 July 2019 07 October 2020 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 18 July 2019 Not Required
Annual return 18 July 2018 15 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 18 July 2018 Not Required
Annual return 18 July 2017 05 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 18 July 2017 Not Required