Financial history ATCHAM WAR MEMORIAL HALL

Charity number: 215995
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 18/07/2017 18/07/2018 18/07/2019 18/07/2020 18/07/2021
Total gross income £8.44k £7.95k £8.47k £26.57k £32.91k
Total expenditure £7.07k £5.30k £6.04k £19.75k £20.42k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £20.00k £17.43k