CHAWNER ALMSHOUSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide low cost housing to the poor & needy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 16 April 1963: Standard registration
- CHAWNER ALMSHOUSES MARCHINGTON STAFFORDSHIRE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian William Morgan | Chair | 10 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
Judith Mary Hope Lewis | Trustee | 14 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Charles Lewis | Trustee | 14 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christina Mann | Trustee | 14 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Patrick Davies | Trustee | 14 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Frederick Boultby | Trustee | 10 February 2016 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL MARRISON | Trustee | 29 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL JOHN MARRISON | Trustee | 29 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
ANNE MARRISON | Trustee | 29 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
PETER JOHN WAINWRIGHT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.78k | £11.58k | £11.92k | £11.27k | £12.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.06k | £3.05k | £50.04k | £3.86k | £23.49k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.00k | £1.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 01 August 2024 | 93 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 27 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 29 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 20 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 22 APRIL 1882 (UN. VOL. 21L PAGE 207).
Charitable objects
MAINTENANCE OF THREE ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR MEN AND WOMEN.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF MARCHINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
11 Woodland Views
Marchington
UTTOXETER
ST14 8NF
- Phone:
- 01283820899
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window