Financial history WILLENHALL AREA RELIEF REHABILITATION AND NURSING TRUST (OTHERWISE KNOWN AS WARRANT)

Charity number: 216097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £80.40k £79.74k £80.19k £80.27k £80.16k
Total expenditure £69.29k £64.91k £66.35k £78.05k £85.07k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A