Trustees WILLENHALL AREA RELIEF REHABILITATION AND NURSING TRUST (OTHERWISE KNOWN AS WARRANT)

Charity number: 216097
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ADA WRIGHTON OBE JP Chair
None on record
Clare Webster Trustee 04 October 2019
None on record
Christine Burley Trustee 10 April 2019
None on record
ROSALIND IRENE TARBUCK Trustee 29 October 2014
WILLENHALL CHAPEL OF EASE ESTATE
Received: On time
Steven Guy Stuart Trustee 08 April 2014
None on record
DEBBIE KAREN COWBURN Trustee 20 May 2013
None on record
BARRY THORNDYKE Trustee 19 May 2013
None on record
ANTHONY ROY HAYWOOD Trustee
None on record
MARGARET ROSE MYATT Trustee
None on record