Financial history SPALDING GENTLEMEN'S SOCIETY

Charity number: 216131
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £107.45k £162.08k £57.98k £71.62k £134.11k
Total expenditure £69.59k £57.79k £43.97k £55.67k £88.10k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £10.00k £24.90k