Trustees SPALDING GENTLEMEN'S SOCIETY

Charity number: 216131
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
David James Mossman Trustee 18 January 2022
None on record
Christopher John Penney Trustee 29 October 2021
HOLBEACH AND EAST ELLOE HOSPITAL TRUST
Received: On time
FARMER EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
HOLBEACH COMMUNITY LARDER
Received: 53 days late
MARY BASS CHARITY
Received: On time
Jonathan Armstrong Dobbs Trustee 29 October 2021
None on record
MELVYN PRICE Trustee 30 September 2020
SPALDING AND DISTRICT CIVIC SOCIETY
Received: On time
CITIZENS ADVICE SOUTH LINCOLNSHIRE
Received: On time
SPALDING RECTORY FEOFFEES
Received: On time
Dr Michael Gilbert Trustee 16 September 2019
THE FRIENDS OF THE CENTRE FOR ENGLISH LOCAL HISTORY
Received: On time
Graham DAYES Trustee 03 May 2019
ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS LINCOLNSHIRE EAST BRANCH
Received: On time
Petronella Gerarda Keeling Trustee 03 May 2019
None on record
ELIZABETH JANE SNEATH Trustee 29 April 2016
SPALDING HOSPICE FOUNDATION
Received: 8 days late
Dr Frazier McKinley Frazier Wood Trustee 24 April 2015
None on record
Ian Hoult Trustee 25 April 2014
None on record
SUSAN BARSLEY Trustee 19 July 2011
None on record
MR TOM GRIMES Trustee
None on record