UNITED CHARITIES

Charity number: 216151
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

to give a voucher to exchange in local businesses for food or fuel to anyone over 60 years of age who have lived in the parish for 5 or more years. Currently given in the provision of a free 4 course seasonal luncheon or afternoon tea to all Tintern Seniors aged 60 and over in a safe, warm, friendly environment, or delivered to their home. The food is provided by Tintern businesses.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 November 2024

Total income: £1,180
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Monmouthshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 May 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CHAPEL HILL UNITED CHARITY (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Noelyn Allen Trustee 27 January 2023
TINTERN RECREATION CENTRE AND VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
FRANCIS BRADFORD
Received: On time
Steve Evans Trustee 25 October 2021
FRANCIS BRADFORD
Received: On time
SUSAN MARGARET HILLARD Trustee 24 August 2015
FRANCIS BRADFORD
Received: On time
STEPHANIE SHEWELL Trustee 31 January 2013
FRANCIS BRADFORD
Received: On time
ELSPETH LYNETTE REID Trustee 06 April 2011
FRANCIS BRADFORD
Received: On time
ANN WEBB WEBB Trustee 06 April 2011
FRANCIS BRADFORD
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/11/2020 01/11/2021 01/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £985 £945 £983 £1.14k £1.18k
Total expenditure £650 £300 £300 £1.00k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 November 2024 13 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 November 2023 21 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2023 Not Required
Annual return 01 November 2022 18 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2022 Not Required
Annual return 01 November 2021 21 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2021 Not Required
Annual return 01 November 2020 21 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 01 November 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEMES OF 1 JULY 1910 AND 5 DECEMBER 1913
Charitable objects
THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF CHAPEL HILL AND PARISH OF TINTERN PARVA GENERALLY OR SUCH POOR PERSONS RESIDENT THEREIN
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF CHAPEL HILL AND TINTERN PARVA
Registration history
  • 26 May 1963 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
2 Quayside Cottage
Tintern
CHEPSTOW
Gwent
NP16 6SZ
Phone:
07501529681
Website:

No information available