Financial history ROSS ALMSHOUSE CHARITY

Charity number: 216162
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £62.96k £126.26k £82.08k £121.93k £89.62k
Total expenditure £69.19k £47.39k £29.86k £65.23k £41.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A