CUDDRA WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 216182
Charity reporting is up to date (30 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 November 2020 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 31 January 2020 92 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2015 20 March 2017 140 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Not Required