Accounts and annual returns ST JUST-IN-PENWITH WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 216189
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 02 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 14 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 14 March 2020 135 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required