Financial history ST JUST-IN-PENWITH WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 216189
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £5.42k £6.45k £6.79k £944 £2.26k
Total expenditure £4.29k £5.78k £4.22k £710 £2.88k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A