Financial history CHARITY OF FRANCES WILSON

Charity number: 216232
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £36.22k £31.15k £31.06k £21.36k £19.43k
Total expenditure £8.41k £13.07k £6.38k £6.09k £50.06k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A