GENERAL CHARITY (COVENTRY)

Charity number: 216235
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £958.72k £996.17k £1.65m £1.69m £4.17m
Total expenditure £1.00m £937.93k £1.66m £1.75m £1.60m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.50m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £437.78k £454.77k £486.88k £496.07k £449.12k
Income - Other £1.08m £1.12m £1.16m £1.19m £1.22m
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.52m £1.46m £1.57m £1.67m £1.53m
Expenditure - Raising funds £51.31k £63.11k £83.53k £81.25k £72.60k
Expenditure - Governance £26.16k £27.81k £28.07k £39.75k £40.94k
Expenditure - Grants institution £561.91k £583.52k £602.63k £617.27k £629.62k
Expenditure - Investment management £51.31k £63.11k £83.53k £81.25k £72.60k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0