GENERAL CHARITY (COVENTRY)

Charity number: 216235
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
RICHARD SMITH Trustee
THE COVENTRY FREEMEN'S CHARITY Received: On time
LADY HERBERT'S HOMES Received: On time
DAVID SCOTT'S COVENTRY JUBILEE COMMUNITY CARE TRUST Received: On time
TERRY PROCTOR BSC Trustee
LADY HERBERT'S HOMES Received: On time
JULIA DAWN MCNANEY Trustee 06 August 2013
LADY HERBERT'S HOMES Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREWS EASTERN GREEN Received: On time
Marcus Lapsa Trustee
LADY HERBERT'S HOMES Received: On time
THE COVENTRY REFUGEE AND MIGRANT CENTRE Received: On time
DAVID MASON Trustee
THE COVENTRY FREEMEN'S CHARITY Received: On time
LADY HERBERT'S HOMES Received: On time
THE COVENTRY GENERAL CHARITY Recently registered
CATHERINE MIKS Trustee 09 July 2012
STOKE ALDERMOOR COMMUNITY FOUNDATION Recently registered
LADY HERBERT'S HOMES Received: On time
Councillor Patricia Hetherton Trustee 27 June 2016 None on record
MICHAEL JOHN HARRIS MBE JP MA Trustee
EVENTIDE HOMES LTD Received: On time
LADY HERBERT'S HOMES Received: On time
THE COVENTRY GENERAL CHARITY Recently registered
Councillor Tarlochan Singh Jandu Trustee 21 October 2019
LADY HERBERT'S HOMES Received: On time
Simon Sharpe Trustee 30 October 2020
LADY HERBERT'S HOMES Received: On time
CRITERION THEATRE LIMITED Received: On time
COUNCILLOR JOSEPH CLIFFORD Trustee 27 June 2016
THE JOHN FRIENDS MEMORIAL FUND Received: On time
BOND'S AND FORD'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITY Received: On time
LADY HERBERT'S HOMES Received: On time
HOLBROOKS COMMUNITY CARE ASSOCIATION RESOURCE AND INFORMATION CENTRE Received: On time
COVENTRY INDEPENDENT ADVICE SERVICE Received: On time
BURTON EAGLE AND MORGAN EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
MARTHA FLINT AND EMMA OSMOND EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
COVENTRY CHURCH (MUNICIPAL) CHARITIES Received: On time
DAVID JOHN EVANS Chair
LADY HERBERT'S HOMES Received: On time
EVENTIDE HOMES LTD Received: On time
THE TRINITY LODGE BENEVOLENT FUND Received: On time
cOUNCILLOR RAM LAKHA OBE Trustee 06 August 2013
LADY HERBERT'S HOMES Received: On time
THE TOM MANN CENTRE TRUST Received: On time
VIVIEN KERSHAW Trustee 09 July 2012
CARERS TRUST HEART OF ENGLAND Received: On time
COVENTRY AND NUNEATON METHODIST CIRCUIT Received: On time
EVENTIDE HOMES LTD Received: On time
LADY HERBERT'S HOMES Received: On time
EDWARD JOHN CURTIS Trustee
KENILWORTH LIONS LIMITED Received: On time
EVENTIDE HOMES LTD Received: On time
THE COVENTRY GENERAL CHARITY Recently registered
LADY HERBERT'S HOMES Received: On time
Dr ROGER NEIL DAVIES Trustee 29 February 2016
LADY HERBERT'S HOMES Received: On time
KENILWORTH TALKING NEWS ASSOCIATION Received: On time