LILLESHALL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 216246
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 11 November 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 17 December 2018 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 18 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required