LILLESHALL RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 216246
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.89k £2.66k £3.00k £3.21k £3.23k
Total expenditure £985 £1.54k £3.14k £1.12k £1.33k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A