Financial history BARNARDO'S

Charity number: 216250
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £312.85m £304.27m £305.96m £296.45m £280.46m
Total expenditure £301.14m £299.81m £305.83m £297.87m £286.15m
Income from government contracts £163.19m £167.15m £166.09m £162.89m £167.84m
Income from government grants £9.41m £6.56m £6.68m £19.19m £49.87m
Income - Donations and legacies £39.60m £40.41m £45.88m £41.88m £41.76m
Income - Other trading activities £70.31m £74.92m £78.37m £77.92m £30.05m
Income - Charitable activities £172.60m £173.72m £172.76m £173.09m £179.29m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £10.27m £0
Income - Investment £2.70m £2.72m £2.48m £2.74m £2.49m
Income - Other £27.64m £12.50m £6.47m £822.00k £26.87m
Income - Legacies £15.02m £16.55m £22.45m £18.03m £18.57m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £212.60m £210.29m £216.77m £214.60m £212.69m
Expenditure - Raising funds £14.74m £14.65m £13.26m £77.17m £68.76m
Expenditure - Governance £1.93m £1.75m £2.34m £2.20m £1.78m
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £300.00k £0
Expenditure - Investment management £262.00k £275.00k £287.00k £392.00k £276.00k
Expenditure - Other £73.80m £74.87m £75.81m £6.10m £4.70m