Trustees BARNARDO'S

Charity number: 216250
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Magdalene Akosua Bayim-Adomako Trustee 24 November 2022
None on record
Henry Chekwube Odogwu Trustee 24 November 2022
None on record
Meredith Pierce Hunter Trustee 01 December 2020
GOODENOUGH COLLEGE
Received: On time
Avis Joy Darzins Trustee 01 December 2020
None on record
Matthew Samuel Davies Trustee 01 September 2020
THE CHYAH DAVIES FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Anne-Cecile France Brigitte Berthier Trustee 01 September 2020
None on record
Briony Marion Ladbury Trustee 12 November 2019
None on record
Samuel Neil Crockett Trustee 12 September 2019
None on record
Penelope Anne Thompson Trustee 12 September 2019
None on record
Rajinder Singh Verma Trustee 12 September 2019
None on record
Dennis Hone Trustee 07 February 2017
THE LONDON PLAYING FIELDS SOCIETY
Received: On time
JOHN BARTLETT Trustee 17 September 2014
THE ROYAL NAVY AND ROYAL MARINES CHARITY
Received: On time