Accounts and annual returns THE T B HUNT OR ST THOMAS AND ST BERNARD TRUST FUND

Charity number: 216406
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 December 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 07 March 2022 35 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 April 2021 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 16 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 02 July 2019 152 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required