Trustees THE T B HUNT OR ST THOMAS AND ST BERNARD TRUST FUND

Charity number: 216406
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dermot John McGilloway Trustee 20 July 2020
ST VINCENT DE PAUL SOCIETY (ENGLAND AND WALES)
Received: On time
Susan Frances Roberts Trustee 20 July 2020
ST VINCENT DE PAUL SOCIETY (ENGLAND AND WALES)
Received: On time
Mark Vernon Thompson Trustee 20 July 2020
None on record
Elaine Heyworth Trustee 25 January 2018
ST VINCENT DE PAUL SOCIETY (ENGLAND AND WALES)
Received: On time
Sebastian Muir Trustee 25 January 2018
None on record
Vincent McCallister Trustee 25 January 2018
None on record
Christine Knight Trustee 25 January 2018
None on record
Ian Kempsell Trustee 25 January 2018
None on record
JAMES BELLAMY Trustee 24 November 2017
BELLINGE COMMUNITY HOUSE
Received: On time
Michael Willcock Trustee 05 September 2015
None on record
RICHARD PALMI Trustee 22 July 2013
None on record
Helen O'Shea Trustee 27 June 2013
DEPAUL INTERNATIONAL
Received: On time
THE PORTA PIA 2012 FOUNDATION
Received: On time