Accounts and annual returns ALITHEA JANE BATES

Charity number: 216427
Charity reporting is overdue by 337 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 337 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 337 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 26 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 07 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 31 July 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required