ZOAR MISSION HALL

Charity number: 251197-1
Removed charity
Governing document
TRUST DEED DATED 12 OCTOBER 1893 ,SCHEME OF 3 JUNE 1955 AND SCHEME OF 13 MARCH 2000
Charitable objects
FOR THE UPKEEP AND MAINTENANCE OF THE FABRIC AND SERVICES OF ANY ONE OR MORE OF THE MISSION HALLS IN THE CITY OF PLYMOUTH CARRIED ON IN CONNEXION WITH THE PLYMOUTH CITY MISSION.
Area of benefit
CITY OF PLYMOUTH
Registration history
  • 03 February 1967: Standard registration
  • 03 May 2000: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
  • 03 May 2000: Funds transferred to 1080221 PLYMOUTH CITY MISSION TRUST LIMITED
Other names

No other names

This charity is a linked charity of