Accounts and annual returns GEORGE MACKENZIE KETTLE'S CHARITY

Charity number: 216625
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 August 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 16 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required