HOSPITAL OF SIR GEORGE ST PAUL

Charity number: 216712
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 18 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 06 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 02 November 2019 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 10 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 07 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required