HOSPITAL OF SIR GEORGE ST PAUL

Charity number: 216712
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £24.49k £6.12k £9.47k £8.48k £10.60k
Total expenditure £4.11k £25.36k £1.83k £7.23k £9.52k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A