Accounts and annual returns THE BRITISH ACADEMY OF FILM AND TELEVISION ARTS

Charity number: 216726
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 28 October 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 29 October 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 October 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2018 05 November 2019 5 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 05 November 2019 5 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2017 11 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 11 October 2018 On time Download Open in new window