Trustees THE BRITISH ACADEMY OF FILM AND TELEVISION ARTS

Charity number: 216726
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Tara Louise Saunders Trustee 06 July 2022
None on record
Elliot Knight Trustee 08 February 2022
None on record
Andrew James Miller MBE Trustee 19 October 2021
THE ROYAL SHAKESPEARE COMPANY, STRATFORD-UPON-AVON
Received: On time
THE ARTS COUNCIL OF ENGLAND
Received: On time
Patrick Keegan Trustee 19 October 2021
FRIENDS OF GILLESPIE PTA
Received: On time
Bal Samra Trustee 19 October 2021
None on record
Siobhan Reddy Trustee 19 October 2021
None on record
Ade Amanda Rawcliffe Trustee 07 July 2020
None on record
Kathy Busby Trustee 03 September 2019
None on record
Anna Elizabeth Higgs Trustee 31 July 2019
None on record
PAUL TAIANO Trustee 30 May 2018
THE NATIONAL HORSERACING MUSEUM
Received: On time
Sir Lloyd Dorfman Trustee 07 November 2017
None on record
Krishnendu Majumdar Trustee 29 June 2015
None on record
Sara Putt Trustee 02 September 2014
None on record