WARWICK UNITED CHARITY

Charity number: 216830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £37.35k £47.34k £68.07k £73.03k £74.15k
Total expenditure £20.90k £44.20k £16.29k £54.06k £59.75k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A