WARWICK UNITED CHARITY

Charity number: 216830
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Mary Frances Noone Cllr Trustee 01 June 2019 None on record
MARTYN ASHFORD Cllr Trustee 07 March 2017
WARWICKSHIRE WELFARE RIGHTS ADVICE SERVICE Received: On time
WARWICK RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
WARWICK PROVIDENT DISPENSARY Received: On time
EDWARD KIBBLER Trustee None on record
GRAHAM SUTHERLAND Trustee None on record
ATKINSON, JOHN Trustee 09 April 2013
WARWICK RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
JANET HONNORATY Chair
WARWICK RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
Neale Murphy Cllr Trustee 01 June 2019
THE CHARITY OF THOMAS OKEN AND NICHOLAS EYFFLER Received: On time
WARWICK PROVIDENT DISPENSARY Received: On time
Lyn Bolton Trustee 14 February 2018 None on record
Ann Lettis Trustee 04 November 2017 None on record