WARWICKSHIRE MASONIC BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 216844
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 30 November 2020 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 30 November 2020 30 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 30 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 28 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 28 October 2017 On time Download