Financial history WARWICKSHIRE MASONIC BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 216844
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £169.20k £529.89k £122.30k £100.31k £422.68k
Total expenditure £148.45k £108.78k £86.48k £218.01k £130.78k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £437.49k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment N/A £92.41k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies N/A £412.84k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £95.37k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £13.41k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance N/A £6.84k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £13.41k N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A