WARWICKSHIRE MASONIC BENEVOLENT FUND

Charity number: 216844
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

26 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Roderick Albert Hinton Trustee 04 July 2019 None on record
JOHN BARRY HAYWARD Trustee 10 July 2013
THE WARWICKSHIRE MASONIC CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION LIMITED Received: On time
THE PROVINCIAL GRAND CHAPTER OF WARWICKSHIRE BENEVOLENT FUND Received: On time
PETER LETCHER BRITTON Trustee
THE WARWICKSHIRE MASONIC CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION LIMITED Received: On time
Philip Hall Trustee 14 September 2014 None on record
MICHAEL ANDRE KENNEDY Trustee None on record
MERVYN JOHN KIMBERLEY Trustee 24 May 2011 None on record
ROBERT HINKS Trustee None on record
David Ronald Graham Trustee 13 October 2016 None on record
LESLIE JAMES TWYNHOLM Trustee 15 October 2015
COMPASS ROSE LODGE NO 9420 BENEVOLENT FUND Received: On time
DAVID ANTHONY BUTCHER Trustee 30 October 2020
READING COURT CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION Received: On time
PETER PHILIP MANNING Trustee 13 October 2016
THE WARWICKSHIRE MASONIC CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION LIMITED Received: On time
Derek Andrew Lodge Trustee 18 May 2019 None on record
Stuart Nigel Esworthy Trustee 13 October 2016
THE WARWICKSHIRE MASONIC CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION LIMITED Received: On time
Peter John Williams Trustee 10 October 2013 None on record
David John Moffat Greenwood Trustee 19 May 2018
THE WARWICKSHIRE MASONIC CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION LIMITED Received: On time
Dr JOSEPH ALLAN JORDAN Trustee 13 October 2016
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BARTHOLOMEW, EDGBASTON Received: On time
BRITISH SOCIETY FOR COLPOSCOPY AND CERVICAL PATHOLOGY Received: 22 days late
THE BIRMINGHAM BIG ART FOUNDATION Received: On time
MOSELEY RUGBY COMMUNITY FOUNDATION Received: On time
Philip Gough Trustee 10 October 2013 None on record
Howard Leslie Smith Trustee 04 July 2019 None on record
Roy Leslie Frederick Kitchen Trustee 13 October 2016 None on record
Reginald albert Francis Willsher Trustee 14 September 2014 None on record
Christoper John Grove MBE Trustee 13 October 2016 None on record
John David Harris Trustee 14 September 2014 None on record
Nigel James Hawkins Trustee 30 October 2020
THE WILLIAM HENRY, 2nd LORD LEIGH MEMORIAL FUND Received: On time
Alan Peter Wright Trustee 13 October 2016 None on record
Geoffrey Walker Trustee 19 May 2018
SANDWELL THIRD AGE ARTS Received: On time
THE WARWICKSHIRE MASONIC CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION LIMITED Received: On time
THE SANDWELL COMMUNITY CARING TRUST Received: On time
SANDWELL VALLEY SCHOOL Received: On time
JOHN KEITH STARLEY Trustee 07 July 2018
DOGS FOR GOOD Received: On time