TAMWORTH MUNICIPAL CHARITY

Charity number: 216875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.60k £2.00k £1.80k £2.00k £492
Total expenditure £1.39k £1.17k £1.55k £1.35k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A