THE DEDHAM ECCLESIASTICAL LECTURESHIP

Charity number: 216907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 03 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 03 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 19 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 10 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 05 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required