THE DEDHAM ECCLESIASTICAL LECTURESHIP

Charity number: 216907
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Clifford Victor Philip Sims Trustee 02 February 2021 None on record
RICHARD ANDREW HOPKINS Trustee None on record
Peter George Wilson Trustee 22 April 2018
THE LITTLEGARTH COTTAGES TRUST Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DEDHAM Received: On time
HEWITT MEMORIAL FUND Received: On time
THE ASSEMBLY ROOMS TRUST, DEDHAM Recently registered
Leonie McLaughlin Trustee 26 February 2018 None on record
Virginia Susan Druitt Trustee 27 September 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF DEDHAM Received: On time
HEWITT MEMORIAL FUND Received: On time
The Venerable Ruth Janet Patten Trustee 12 May 2019
DYNAMIC NEW ANGLIAN NETWORKS Received: 5 days late
THE REVEREND DOCTOR GEORGE RICHARDS' CHARITY FOR POOR CLERGYMEN Received: On time
THE CHELMSFORD DIOCESAN BOARD OF FINANCE Received: On time
ARCHDEACON BURNEY'S CHARITY Received: On time