SIR ROBERT COKE'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 217120
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £20.43k £18.08k £18.08k £19.34k £19.70k
Total expenditure £5.56k £2.28k £3.81k £5.39k £4.65k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A