CHARITY OF JOHN PEPPER
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Annual donation to people of Stoke on trent
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Staffordshire
- Stoke-on-trent City
Governance
- 24 October 1963: Standard registration
- 21 September 2010: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 21 September 2010: Funds transferred to 1091628 Community Foundation for Staffordshire and Shropsh...
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £296 | £364 | £386 | £480 | £509 | |
|
Total expenditure | £361 | £336 | £299 | £533 | £396 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 25 August 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 10 November 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 12 December 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED 25.8.1942 AND SCHEME SEALED 25.11.1958
Charitable objects
DISTRIBUTION F GIFTS OF MONEY EACH YEAR, TO AGED PRSONS RESIDENT IN THE POTTERIES WHO THROUGH NO FAULT OF THEIR OWN ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE.
Area of benefit
CITY OF STOKE ON TRENT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window