THE REDBOURN CHARITIES

Charity number: 217154
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 30 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 30 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 22 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 22 February 2020 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 02 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 02 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 13 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 13 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 24 April 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 24 April 2017 On time Download