Financial history CHARITIES OF FREDERICK HAMEYER AND OTHERS

Charity number: 217201
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £43 £44 £45 £46 £48
Total expenditure £43 £44 £45 £46 £48
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A