SAPCOTE'S CHARITY

Charity number: 217348
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £9.18k £11.71k £7.58k £10.96k £12.31k
Total expenditure £15.14k £16.20k £11.76k £24.19k £9.44k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 N/A N/A N/A