Financial history MUNICIPAL GENERAL CHARITY

Charity number: 217437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £56.44k £41.64k £38.91k £40.30k £428.81k
Total expenditure £53.18k £51.83k £44.67k £38.84k £60.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A