Trustees MUNICIPAL GENERAL CHARITY

Charity number: 217437
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOAN WHICHER Chair
None on record
Sam Smith Trustee 14 July 2021
None on record
MICHAEL GAMAGE Trustee 28 February 2020
ST LEONARD'S HOSPITAL
Received: On time
Michael Davies Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
Mathew Skinner Trustee 01 April 2018
None on record
LAWRENCE GEORGE ASLIN Trustee 07 March 2016
None on record
EMILY DALTON Trustee 02 November 2015
None on record
Irene Brown Trustee 01 March 2014
THE MAGNUS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ST LEONARD'S HOSPITAL
Received: On time
THE MAGNUS CHARITY
Received: On time
JEAN MOORE MBE JP Trustee
LILLEY AND STONE SCHOOL CHARITY
Received: 39 days late
THE MARY ELIZABETH SIEBEL CHARITY
Received: 2 days late
ST LEONARD'S HOSPITAL
Received: On time
THE NEWARK AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER
Overdue by 104 days
THE W E KNIGHT EDUCATION TRUST
Received: On time
VALERIE PICKER Trustee
ST LEONARD'S HOSPITAL
Received: On time
MAX COPE Trustee
None on record
ANTHONY CHARLES ROBERTS Trustee
None on record
DOREEN WESTMORELAND Trustee
None on record