ST LEONARD'S HOSPITAL

Charity number: 217439
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 03 June 2020 16 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 03 June 2020 16 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 03 June 2019 04 March 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 03 June 2019 04 March 2020 On time Download
Annual return 03 June 2018 29 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 03 June 2018 29 March 2019 On time Download
Annual return 03 June 2017 22 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 03 June 2017 22 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 03 June 2016 16 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 03 June 2016 16 March 2017 On time Download