ST LEONARD'S HOSPITAL

Charity number: 217439
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 03/06/2016 03/06/2017 03/06/2018 03/06/2019 03/06/2020
Total gross income £366.73k £309.60k £288.15k £368.06k £310.09k
Total expenditure £260.19k £314.32k £360.25k £399.96k £358.11k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A