ST LEONARD'S HOSPITAL

Charity number: 217439
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

14 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JEAN MOORE MBE JP Trustee
LILLEY AND STONE SCHOOL CHARITY Received: 31 days late
THE MARY ELIZABETH SIEBEL CHARITY Received: 2 days late
MUNICIPAL GENERAL CHARITIES FOR THE POOR Received: On time
THE EAST AND WEST LAUGHTON ESTATE CHARITY Overdue by 38 days
THE NEWARK AND DISTRICT TALKING NEWSPAPER Received: On time
THE W E KNIGHT EDUCATION TRUST Received: On time
Roy Williams Trustee 15 February 2018 None on record
Rev Elizabeth Murray Trustee 01 April 2018 None on record
Paul Simpson Trustee 07 March 2019 None on record
Richard Derry Trustee 07 March 2019 None on record
Jane Fawcett Trustee 12 March 2014 None on record
MAUREEN DOBSON Trustee
NEWARK COMMUNITY FIRST AID Received: On time
COLLINGHAM YOUTH AND COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION Received: On time
ADRIAN SHAW Trustee None on record
ROBERT BENBOW Trustee None on record
Graham Hicks Trustee 12 March 2014 None on record
Laurence Goff Trustee 31 August 2019 None on record
VALERIE PICKER Trustee
MUNICIPAL GENERAL CHARITIES FOR THE POOR Received: On time
THE EAST AND WEST LAUGHTON ESTATE CHARITY Overdue by 38 days
Irene Brown Trustee 01 July 2019
THE MAGNUS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE MAGNUS CHARITY Received: On time
MUNICIPAL GENERAL CHARITIES FOR THE POOR Received: On time
THE EAST AND WEST LAUGHTON ESTATE CHARITY Overdue by 38 days
MICHAEL GAMAGE Trustee 29 June 2017
MUNICIPAL GENERAL CHARITIES FOR THE POOR Received: On time