TRUST PROPERTY HELD FOR ECCLESIASTICAL PURPOSES IN CONNEXION WITH THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND

Charity number: 217492
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 10 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 29 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 24 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 04 December 2017 34 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required