THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES

Charity number: 217497
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019
Total gross income £18.76k £19.47k £19.93k £20.53k £21.26k
Total expenditure £10.38k £9.50k £21.14k £10.10k £9.34k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A