THE FENNELL MEMORIAL HOMES

Charity number: 217497
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

16 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Paul Hopfensperger Trustee 06 March 2018
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
SUSAN GAINSBOROUGH SOPER Trustee
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT Received: On time
VIRGINIA DEAN Trustee None on record
Mark Merriam Trustee 03 March 2020
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON Received: On time
The Very Reverend Joseph Patricius Hawes Trustee 04 September 2018
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT Received: On time
OLD SCHOOL FUND Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY Received: On time
George Edward James COCKRAM Trustee
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT Received: On time
OLIVER WILLIAM PEACOCK Chair None on record
Carol Bull Trustee 06 June 2017
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON Received: On time
Gregory Luton Trustee 06 June 2018
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES Received: On time
John Augustine Trustee 29 September 2020
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON Received: On time
JOHN GRIFFITHS Trustee None on record
Rev Simon John Harvey Trustee 05 March 2019
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY WITH ST PETER, BURY ST EDMUNDS Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY Received: On time
Hannah BLACK Trustee 07 March 2017
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON Received: On time
SIMON FRANCIS POTT FRICS Trustee
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE DAY FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE ICKWORTH CHURCH CONSERVATION TRUST Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY Received: On time
GENERAL THE HONOURABLE SIR WILLIAM HERVEY Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT Received: On time
THE LITTLE GIDDING TRUST LIMITED Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES Received: On time
BURY ST EDMUNDS HERITAGE TRUST
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
HENRY REGINALD SALTMARSH FCA Trustee
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE VOLUNTARY NETWORK
THE CHARITY OF SIR THOMAS AND LADY KYTSON Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES Received: On time
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
PAUL ANDREW KNIGHTS Trustee 20 March 2017
BATTELEY AND SUTTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
CHARITY OF SIR JOHN JAMES Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT ALMSHOUSE RESIDENTS' CHARITY Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
GUILDHALL FEOFFMENT Received: On time
DOCTOR CLOPTON'S CHARITY Received: On time